Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/30/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/10/2014