Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/20/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/02/2013