Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/16/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/16/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/26/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2014