Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/09/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/17/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013