Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/16/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/18/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/24/2013