Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/17/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/03/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/06/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/06/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/06/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/06/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/06/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/06/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2013