Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 11/21/2013