Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/07/2014