Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/17/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/26/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/19/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/05/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/26/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2014