Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/22/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/01/2014