Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/05/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/12/2013