Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/05/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/26/2014