Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/25/2014