Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/20/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/12/2013