Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/20/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/20/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/22/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/22/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/05/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/05/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/17/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/26/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 01/07/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/25/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/05/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/26/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/03/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/03/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/10/2014