Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/07/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/08/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/05/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/17/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/10/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/27/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/17/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/26/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/04/2014