Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/22/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/06/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/17/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/18/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/01/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/01/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/16/2013