Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/22/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/07/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/13/2014