Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/05/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/05/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/05/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/22/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/11/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2014