Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/07/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/07/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/07/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/07/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/08/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/09/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/09/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/14/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/14/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/16/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/17/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/03/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/06/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/19/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/25/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/27/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/09/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/26/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/08/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/08/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/28/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/09/2014