Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/17/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/17/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/24/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/12/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/13/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/13/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/24/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/08/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/11/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/18/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/28/2013