Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/27/2013