Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/12/2013