Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/05/2014