Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/10/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/11/2013