Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/06/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/15/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/03/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/03/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/05/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/25/2014