Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/08/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/20/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/23/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/06/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 06/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/09/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/30/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/18/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/20/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/23/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/15/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/07/2014