Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/04/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/04/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/04/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/13/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/10/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/24/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/18/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/30/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/10/2013