Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/13/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/13/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/24/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/24/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/24/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/04/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/10/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/17/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/17/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/27/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/28/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/08/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/16/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/16/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/16/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/26/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/17/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/08/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/26/2014