Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/24/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/29/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/29/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/29/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/29/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/05/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/05/2014