Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/24/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/11/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/01/2014