Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 08/01/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 08/01/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/19/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/27/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/08/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/08/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/14/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/23/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 11/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/20/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/09/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/19/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/19/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/13/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/28/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/27/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/04/2014