Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 04/26/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/11/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/07/2014