Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/21/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/04/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/01/2014