Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/26/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/14/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/14/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/25/2014