Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/30/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/04/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/04/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/11/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/28/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/08/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/15/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/16/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/17/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/28/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/28/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/26/2014