Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/20/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/23/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/03/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/10/2013