Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/03/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/03/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/05/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/14/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/14/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/14/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/01/2014