Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 04/24/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/15/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/15/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/22/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/23/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/17/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 08/02/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/12/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/28/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/09/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/26/2014