Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/15/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/12/2013