Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/26/2014