Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/06/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/19/2013