Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/17/2013