Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/21/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/19/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/16/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/29/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/27/2014