Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/08/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/03/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/10/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/24/2014