Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/12/2013