Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/28/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/08/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/04/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/25/2014