Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/26/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/26/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/17/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/06/2014