Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/19/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/28/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/11/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/24/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/14/2014