Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/01/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 02/01/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/01/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/04/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/26/2013